VA HB149 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; lower rate for certain businesses. Reduces the corporate income tax rate from six percent to three percent for the first three years after a business located outside Virginia opens a satellite office in a Virginia locality with a population of 200,000 or fewer or after a business located in a Virginia locality with a population exceeding 200,000 opens a satellite office or operation in a Virginia locality with a population of 200,000 or fewer, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2012. The capital investment made by the corporation must be $250,000 or more and the tax reduction may not exceed the amount of that capital investment.
Title
Income tax, corporate; lower rate for certain businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-02-06 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-01-12 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2012-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102553D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB149 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB149+hil |