VA HB1487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - VOTE: DEFEATED (47-Y 49-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - VOTE: DEFEATED (47-Y 49-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Meetings of local governing body; live broadcast and archive. Requires localities to provide a live video broadcast of public meetings of the local governing body and to archive such broadcasts on their websites.
Title
Local government; live audio or video broadcast and archive of meetings.
Sponsors
Del. Marie March [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (47-Y 49-N) (Y: 47 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (47-Y 49-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (47-Y 49-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 23100033D-E |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1487E |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100033D |