VA HB1487 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health services in local and regional correctional facilities. Requires the Board of Corrections to adopt standards for mental health services in local and regional correctional facilities, which shall include a requirement that (i) the sheriff of every county and city in which a local correctional facility is located enter into an agreement with the community services board serving that county or city for the delivery of mental health and substance abuse services in the local correctional facility and (ii) the administrator of every regional correctional facility enter into an agreement with the community services board or boards serving the counties and cities participating in the regional correctional facility for the delivery of mental health and substance abuse services in the regional correctional facility. The bill also requires community services boards to provide mental health and substance abuse services to individuals in local and regional correctional facilities and establishes a procedure for the delivery of services to individuals released from local and regional correctional facilities by the community services board serving the local or regional correctional facility or the community services board serving the county or city in which the individual will reside upon his release.
Title
Correctional facilities, local and regional; standards for mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (12-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105062D |