VA HB1480 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Board; authority to hear fair housing violations by real estate licensees. Clarifies that in any case in which there are multiple respondents and one of the respondents is a real estate licensee, the case involving both the real estate licensee and the respondent who is a property owner or his agent or principal who has engaged a real estate licensee shall be heard by the Real Estate Board and not the Fair Housing Board. The bill also provides that in no event shall the jurisdiction be split between the Real Estate Board and the Fair Housing Board on the same such case.
Title
Real Estate Board; authority to hear fair housing violations by real estate licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1480ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1480H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104240D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104240D-H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101780D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Housing
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Housing
Professions and Occupations
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax