VA HB1474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; educational programs. Requires educational programs for the governing boards of public institutions of higher education to include presentations relating to (i) board members' primary duty to the citizens of the Commonwealth and (ii) student debt trends.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; governing boards, educational programs.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104173D |