VA HB147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reimbursement of expenses incurred in responding Reimbursement of expenses incurred in responding to terrorism hoax incident, bomb threat, malicious activation of fire alarm, or false emergency communication to emergency personnel. Allows a locality that has an ordinance requiring any person over 18 years of age convicted of false emergency communication to emergency personnel to reimburse such locality at the time of sentencing or in a separate civil action to bill a flat fee of $2,500 or a minute-by-minute accounting of actual costs incurred. The bill also allows a locality that has an ordinance requiring any person under 18 years of age convicted of false emergency communication to emergency personnel to reimburse such locality at the time of sentencing or in a separate civil action to bill a flat fee of $2,500 or a minute-by-minute accounting of actual costs incurred, not to exceed $2,500. Current law allows a flat fee of $250 or a minute-by-minute accounting of actual costs incurred, in an amount not to exceed $2,500.
Title
Terrorism hoax incident, etc.; reimbursement of expenses incurred to localities.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104284D |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Stricken at request of Patron in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)