VA HB1468 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer Data Protection Act; enforcement by the Attorney General; civil penalty. Permits the Attorney General to prohibit TikTok from being available to known minors in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that a civil penalty of $7,500 may be assessed for violations by TikTok unless such website or application could not have reasonably known or have had reason to know of such operation in the Commonwealth.
Title
Consumer Data Protection Act; enforcement by the Attorney General, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107016D-H1 |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104008D |