VA HB1448 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
No expungement for juvenile court deferral and dismissal. Provides that a delinquency or traffic proceeding case that is dismissed in Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Court following the satisfaction of terms and conditions of a deferred judgment is not eligible for expungement. Under current law, a person who has been the subject of such a proceeding who has been found innocent thereof, or for whom such proceeding was otherwise dismissed, may file a motion requesting the destruction of all records pertaining to the charge.
Title
Juvenile court deferral and dismissal; cases ineligible for expungement of records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-11-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-11-22 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100548D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1448 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1448+hil |