VA HB1443 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure by the Commissioner of Social Services; submission of financial information. Reduces from three to one the number of credit references that an applicant for initial licensure as a child welfare agency, assisted living facility, or adult day care center must submit to be exempt from the requirement that the applicant make his financial records available to the Commissioner of Social Services for review; adds a requirement for submission of an operating budget at the time of application for an initial license as a child welfare agency, assisted living facility, or adult day care center seeking an exemption from the requirement that an applicant make financial records available to the Commissioner of Social Service; and eliminates the requirement that the Commissioner investigate the financial responsibility of an applicant for renewal of a license as a child welfare agency, assisted living facility, or adult day care center. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Social Serices, Commissioner of; submission of financial information by applicant, licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 182 (effective 3/12/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1443ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 13105041D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1443S1 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105041D-S1 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105041D-S1 |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103993D-EH1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1443EH1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Amendments by Delegate O'Bannon agreed to |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13103993D-H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 13103993D-H1 |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2012-12-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100521D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1310 (Same As) 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)