VA HB1429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; nondiscrimination; gender identity or transgender status. Prohibits a health carrier from denying or limiting coverage or imposing additional cost sharing or other limitations or restrictions on coverage, under a health benefit plan for health care services that are ordinarily or exclusively available to covered individuals of one sex, to a transgender individual on the basis of the fact that the individual's sex assigned at birth, gender identity, or gender otherwise recorded is different from the one to which such health services are ordinarily or exclusively available. The measure also prohibits a health carrier from (i) subjecting an individual to discrimination under a health benefit plan on the basis of gender identity or being a transgender individual or (ii) requiring that an individual, as a condition of enrollment or continued enrollment under a health benefit plan, pay a premium that is greater than the premium for a similarly situated covered person enrolled in the plan on the basis of the covered person's gender identity or being a transgender individual. The measure requires health carriers to assess medical necessity according to nondiscriminatory criteria that are consistent with current medical standards.
Title
Health insurance; nondiscrimination, gender identity or transgender status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1429ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103621D-E |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1429E |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103621D |