VA HB1427 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0837)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wireless support structures; public rights-of-way use fees. Establishes an annual wireless support structure public rights-of-way use fee to be charged to wireless services providers and wireless infrastructure providers in connection with a permit for occupation and use of the public rights-of-way under the jurisdiction of the Department of Transportation (VDOT) for the construction of new wireless support structures. The amount of the use fee is (i) $1,000 for any wireless support structure at or below 50 feet in height; (ii) $3,000 for any wireless support structure above 50 feet and at or below 120 feet in height; (iii) $5,000 for any wireless support structure above 120 feet in height; and (iv) $1 per square foot for any other equipment, shelter, or associated facilities constructed on the ground. The measure provides that the use fee amounts shall be adjusted every five years on the basis of inflation. The measure also provides that VDOT may elect to continue enforcing any existing agreement, contract, license, easement, or permit allowing the use of the public rights-of-way by a wireless services provider or wireless infrastructure provider existing prior to July 1, 2018. This bill is identical to SB 823.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless support structures; public rights-of-way use fees established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 2-A) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0837)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 837 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1427ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1427ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
2018-02-28SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-19SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N 2-A)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 14-N 2-A)
2018-02-08HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 18104250D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1427
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1427+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1427ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1427ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0837+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0046+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0488+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0122+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0299+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB1427+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0755HB1427+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1655+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB1427+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB1427+HB1427
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1261HB1427+HB1427

Bill Comments

feedback