VA HB1426 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Social services; Dynamic Benefit Adjustment System. Establishes a Dynamic Benefit Adjustment System that gradually reduces public assistance benefits in response to beneficiaries' earned income. The bill requires the Department of Social Services to establish the formula for the system, collect and analyze data on the System, and make regular reports on the System's performance to the General Assembly.
Title
Dynamic Benefit Adjustment System; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106201D-H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105131D |