VA HB1418 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; workplace harassment; civil actions by private parties. Creates a cause of action against any employer employing more than five employees who discharges or engages in an unlawful discriminatory act against any employee on the basis of race; color; religion; national origin; sex; sexual orientation; gender identity; pregnancy; childbirth or related medical conditions, including lactation; marital status; status as a veteran; or age, if the employee if 40 years of age or older. The bill permits a court, in cases where the employee prevails, to award compensatory or punitive damages and reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill provides rules for determining whether conduct constitutes workplace harassment, defined in the bill, and lays out a number of factors to consider in determining whether conduct constitutes workplace harassment.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; discrimination on the basis of sex, sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109063D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109063D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1418H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107400D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107400D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102728D |