VA HB1415 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Henrietta Lacks Commission; report; sunset. Creates the Henrietta Lacks Commission to establish through a public-private partnership the Henrietta Lacks Life Sciences Center in Halifax County as a cancer research and treatment center designed to (i) transform and accelerate cancer research and treatment through the use of biodata tools, (ii) provide tailored cancer treatment medicine to an underserved portion of rural Southside Virginia, and (iii) incubate new biotech businesses across the Southside Virginia region. The bill requires the Commission to annually submit a report on its interim activity and work to the Governor and General Assembly. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2021. This bill is identical to SB 171.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Henrietta Lacks Commission; established.

Sponsors

Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. Dawn Adams [D]Del. Les Adams [R]Del. Lashrecse Aird [D]
Del. John Bell [D]Del. Robert Bell [R]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D]
Del. Jennifer Boysko [D]Del. Emily Brewer [R]Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Kathy Byron [R]
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R]Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Jennifer Foy [D]Del. Lee Carter [D]
Del. Matt Fariss [R]Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Hyland Fowler [R]Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]
Del. Scott Garrett [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]Del. Wendy Gooditis [D]Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]
Del. Gregory Habeeb [R]Del. C.E. Hayes [D]Del. Gordon Helsel [R]Del. Steve Heretick [D]
Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]Del. Patrick Hope [D]Del. Timothy Hugo [R]
Del. Chris Hurst [D]Del. Riley Ingram [R]Del. Matthew James [D]Del. Jerrauld Jones [D]
Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Terry Kilgore [R]Del. Barry Knight [R]Del. Kaye Kory [D]
Del. Paul Krizek [D]Del. Steven Landes [R]Del. Dave LaRock [R]Del. Mark Levine [D]
Del. Daniel Marshall [R]Del. John McGuire [R]Del. Delores McQuinn [D]Del. Jason Miyares [R]
Del. Michael Mullin [D]Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]Del. Israel O'Quinn [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]
Del. Christopher Peace [R]Del. Todd Pillion [R]Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Brenda Pogge [R]
Del. Charles Poindexter [R]Del. Marcia Price [D]Del. Margaret Ransone [R]Del. Sam Rasoul [D]
Del. David Reid [D]Del. Debra Rodman [D]Del. Danica Roem [D]Del. Larry Rush [R]
Del. Marcus Simon [D]Del. Christopher Stolle [R]Del. Robert Thomas [R]Del. Luke Torian [D]
Del. David Toscano [D]Del. Kathy Tran [D]Del. Cheryl Turpin [D]Del. Roslyn Tyler [D]
Del. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D]Del. Jeion Ward [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Vivian Watts [D]
Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. David Yancey [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1415ER)
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18104386D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1415E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2018-02-02HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-01HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-23HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2018-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 18104386D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222101(n/a)See Bill Text
222537(n/a)See Bill Text
222543(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1415
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1415+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1415E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1415ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0705+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1203V0036+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0073+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0205V0011+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0056+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0691+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0142+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB1415+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0885HB1415+HB1415
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1449+HB1415

Bill Comments

feedback