VA HB1415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Goochland, Powhatan, Transient occupancy tax; Goochland, Powhatan, and Warren Counties. Adds the Counties of Goochland, Powhatan, and Warren to the list of counties authorized to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed five percent, provided that any excess over two percent is designated and spent solely for tourism purposes. Under current law, all counties are authorized to impose such tax at a rate not to exceed two percent, and specified counties may impose the tax at a rate not to exceed five percent.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; Goochland, Powhatan, and Warren Counties authorized to impose.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1415ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100691D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1415E |
2017-01-25 | House | Amendments by Delegate Ware agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 9-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-10-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-10-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100691D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Goochland County
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds
Powhatan County
Taxation
Transient Tax
Warren County
Goochland County
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds
Powhatan County
Taxation
Transient Tax
Warren County