VA HB140 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries. Changes the date of establishment that qualifies historical African American cemeteries for appropriated funds to care for such cemeteries from prior to January 1, 1900, to prior to January 1, 1948, and provides that the total number of graves in a qualifying cemetery shall be the number of markers of African Americans who were interred in such cemetery prior to January 1, 1948. Under current law, the total number of graves is the number of markers of African Americans who lived at any time between January 1, 1800, and January 1, 1900.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries; changes date of establishment for qualification of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB140ER) |
2022-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106690D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB140S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106690D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106690D-S1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101675D-E |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB140E |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101675D |
Same As/Similar To
SB477 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
SB477 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
SB477 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0187)
Subjects
African Americans
Conservation
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Conservation
Historic Areas Landmarks and Monuments
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries