VA HB1399 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Broadway. Amends the town's charter to reflect the recent change to November municipal elections and changes the mayor's term from two years to four years. This bill is identical to SB 546.
Title
Broadway, Town of; amending charter, November municipal elections.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1399ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104072D |