VA HB1390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lottery funds; Rural Transportation Fund. Establishes the Rural Transportation Fund, to be funded by transferring 10 percent of annual lottery revenues in fiscal years 2020 through 2024 from the Lottery Proceeds Fund. All lottery revenues transferred to the Rural Transportation Fund shall be used solely for the purposes of funding transportation projects in (i) Planning District 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, or 6 or (ii) any locality with a population of no greater than 100,000.
Title
Rural Transportation Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102156D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1533 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |