VA HB1390 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bond referenda; authorizing counties to make bond issuance contingent on enactment of a food and beverage tax. Authorizes counties to enact ordinances providing that bonds shall be repaid from food and beverage tax revenues. The bill provides that if a county enacts such an ordinance, the referendum submitted to the voters shall include as a single question the issuance of bonds and the enactment of a food and beverage tax. Under current law, the questions of bond issuance and tax enactment are submitted as separate ballot questions.
Title
Food and beverage tax; counties to enact ordinances providing that bonds shall be paid from revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1390ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107581D-S1 (80-Y 18-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1390S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107581D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107581D-S1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (76-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104922D |