VA HB1380 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Directed Trust Act. Codifies the Uniform Directed Trust Act, which expressly validates terms of a trust that provide for a trust director, a term that is defined in the Act, and prescribes a set of rules for directed trusts, including allocation of fiduciary duties.
Title
Uniform Directed Trust Act; codifies Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1380ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102232D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 752 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 756 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 770 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 779.26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 779.38 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |