VA HB1377 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health services plan; program for residents of other state. Provides that, if another state enacts a law that requires a nonprofit health service plan operating in Virginia to provide a specified program for residents of the other state, the State Corporation Commission (SCC) may hold a hearing to evaluate the impact of the law on the health services plan. The SCC shall direct the Commissioner of Insurance to conduct an examination of the health services plan. The measure authorizes the SCC to issue orders to protect residents of the Commonwealth.
Title
Health services plan; hearings and investigations on effect of other state's law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 704 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1377ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1377H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104877D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104877D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10101644D |