VA HB1373 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm transfer and directs the Department of State Police (the Department) to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a check from licensed firearms dealers. A transferor who sells a firearm to another person without obtaining the required background check is guilty of a Class 6 felony. The bill exempts transfers (i) between immediate family members, (ii) that occur by operation of law, (iii) by the executor or administrator of an estate or by the trustee of a testamentary trust, and (iv) that are temporary and occur in the presence of the owner of the firearm or are necessary to prevent imminent death or serious bodily injury. The bill removes the provision that makes background checks of prospective purchasers or transferees at firearms shows voluntary. The bill also provides that the Department shall have three business days to complete a criminal history record information check before a firearm may be transferred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks, penalty.


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-13HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18104696D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
5414201.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments