VA HB1367 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Department of Emergency Management; local sheltering data. Requires localities to provide the State Coordinator of Emergency Management with certain data related to emergency sheltering capabilities on or before May 1 of each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management, Virginia Department of; local sheltering data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0228)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 228 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1367ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2018-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-30HouseRead first time
2018-01-26HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2018-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 18102704D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1367
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1367+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1367ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0228+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1502V0006+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H15V0008+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0194+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0212+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0145+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB1367+HB1367
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB1367+HB1367

Bill Comments

feedback