VA HB1359 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0903)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0903)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jurisdiction of civil claims; amending amount of claim. Provides that, while a matter is pending in a circuit court, upon motion of the plaintiff seeking to decrease the amount of the claim to within exclusive or concurrent jurisdiction of the general district court, the circuit court shall order transfer of the matter to the general district court having jurisdiction over the claim without requiring a dismissal of the claim or a nonsuit. The bill provides that the tolling of the applicable statutes of limitations governing the pending matter shall be unaffected by the transfer. The bill further provides that, except for good cause shown, no such order of transfer shall issue unless the motion to amend and transfer is made at least 10 days before trial and requires that the plaintiff shall pay filing and other fees to the clerk of the court to which the case is transferred, prepare and present the order of transfer to the transferring court for entry, and provide a certified copy of the transfer order to the receiving court.
Title
Jurisdiction of civil claims; amending amount of claim, transfer of matter, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0903) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 903 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1359ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1359H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106612D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106612D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100513D |