VA HB1357 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institute for Advanced Learning and Research; Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees; powers and duties; specialized noncredit workforce training. Requires the Institute for Advanced Learning and Research to encourage and coordinate the development and delivery of noncredit courses with a focus on statewide and regional critical shortage areas and the needs of industry that include needed adult education and workforce training. The bill requires the board of trustees of the Institute for Advanced Learning and Research and the Roanoke Higher Education Authority to seek opportunities to collaborate with local comprehensive community colleges to meet specialized noncredit workforce training needs identified by industry but provides that if local comprehensive community colleges are unable to meet identified industry needs, then the board of trustees may seek to collaborate with other education providers or other public or private organizations to provide, or itself may provide, specialized noncredit workforce training independent of local comprehensive community colleges. The bill's directives are subject to the availability of funding other than from general funds. Institute for Advanced Learning and Research; Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees; powers and duties; specialized noncredit workforce training. Requires the Institute for Advanced Learning and Research to encourage and coordinate the development and delivery of noncredit courses with a focus on statewide and regional critical shortage areas and the needs of industry that include needed adult education and workforce training. The bill requires the board of trustees of the Institute for Advanced Learning and Research and the Roanoke Higher Education Authority to seek opportunities to collaborate with local comprehensive community colleges to meet specialized noncredit workforce training needs identified by industry but provides that if local comprehensive community colleges are unable to meet identified industry needs, then the board of trustees may seek to collaborate with other education providers or other public or private organizations to provide, or itself may provide, specialized noncredit workforce training independent of local comprehensive community colleges. The bill's directives are subject to the availability of funding other than from general funds.
Title
Advanced Learning and Research, Institute for; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220) | |
2024-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1357ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108807D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1357S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108807D-S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108807D-S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Higher Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2024-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104014D |