VA HB1356 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local license fees and taxes; campgrounds, bed and breakfast establishments. Adds campgrounds and bed and breakfast establishments to those real property rental businesses that are not exempt from local license fees and taxes.
Title
License fees and taxes, local; exempts campgrounds and bed and breakfast establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 648 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1356ER) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10104288D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1356E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (19-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104288D |