VA HB1354 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lighting devices on motor vehicles; covering. Provides that if certain lighting devices are unlit, have a clear lens, and have a clear reflector if the lighting device has a reflector, then a vehicle equipped with such lighting device may be operated on the highways without covering the lighting device.
Title
Motor vehicles; covered & unlit lighting devices.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1354ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1354H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106401D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106401D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Ad Hoc Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104537D |