VA HB1354 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Animal Cruelty Conviction List established. Requires the Superintendent of State Police to establish and maintain an Animal Cruelty Conviction List available to the public on the website of the Department of State Police by 2017. The list shall include the names of persons convicted of certain felony animal cruelty offenses on or after July 1, 2015. Persons so convicted will be required to pay a fee of $50 per conviction to fund the maintenance of the list. The bill requires the State Police to remove a person from the list after 15 years if he has no additional felony conviction of a relevant animal cruelty offense.
Title
Animal Cruelty Conviction List; established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100455D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1354 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1354+hil |