VA HB1349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage performing arts facility licenses; on-and-off premises wine and beer licenses. Defines performing arts facility and sports facility and standardizes the eligibility criteria for annual mixed beverage performing arts facility licenses and on-and-off-premises wine and beer licenses for performing arts food concessionaires. Under current law, the eligibility criteria for such licenses varies by location and includes inconsistent ownership, lease, capacity, and seating requirements. The bill also removes provisions that allow the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority to grant annual mixed beverage motor sports facility licenses and motor car sporting event facility licenses and creates an annual mixed beverage sports facility license, which may be granted to persons operating a sports facility or food concessions at a sports facility and would authorize the licensee to sell mixed beverages during any event and immediately subsequent thereto to patrons within all seating areas, concourses, walkways, concession areas, and additional locations designated by the Board (i) in closed containers for off-premises consumption or (ii) in paper, plastic, or similar disposable containers or in single original metal cans for on-premises consumption.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage performing arts facility licenses.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Jason Ballard [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Anne Ferrell Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 111 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1349ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1349H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105900D-H1 |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105900D-H1 |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105204D |
Same As/Similar To
SB657 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
HB101 (Similar To) 2024-01-30 - Tabled in General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
SB180 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
SB400 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
SB724 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
HB101 (Similar To) 2024-01-30 - Tabled in General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
SB180 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
SB400 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
SB724 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0627)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |