VA HB1331 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Review of child support guidelines; federal compliance. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to ensure that the Commonwealth's current child support guidelines are reviewed by the Child Support Guidelines Review Panel (the Panel) by October 1, 2018. The bill requires the Panel to identify any modifications to the Commonwealth's current child support guidelines that are necessary in order to bring such guidelines into compliance with the provisions of 45 C.F.R. §302.56 by December 31, 2019, and to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2018.
Title
Child support; review of guidelines federal compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104022D |