VA HB1326 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; medical services. Provides that a health care provider rendering medical services outside Virginia to an injured worker whose claim and injuries have been accepted as compensable under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act shall be reimbursed for authorized, reasonable and necessary medical treatment in an amount equal to the workers' compensation fee schedule, if any, adopted by that state. If the other state does not have a fee schedule, the provider will be reimbursed based on the charges prevailing in the same community for similar treatment when the treatment is paid for by the injured person. The measure also directs the Workers' Compensation Commission to appoint a task force to develop recommendations relating to reductions or discounts for multiple surgical procedures performed during a single operative session, liability for the costs of assistants-at-surgery, and whether prompt payment to medical providers should be required. The Commission shall develop regulations addressing these issues by November 30, 2011.
Title
Workers' compensation; medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10105306D-EH1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1326EH1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Amendment by Delegate Janis agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Emergency clause deleted | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105306D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105306D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 10104156D |