VA HB1324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Efficiency Evaluation Fund; grants to localities. Creates the Efficiency Evaluation Fund to provide matching grants to localities to pay for evaluations by private consultants to determine ways in which localities may become more efficient.
Title
Efficiency Evaluation Fund; established, grants to localities.
Sponsors
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2012-11-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2012-11-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100672D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2441 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2442 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2443 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |