VA HB1322 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; admissions applications; criminal history. Prohibits each public institution of higher education, with the exception of the Virginia Military Institute, from (i) utilizing an institution-specific admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant or (ii) denying admission to any applicant on the basis of any criminal history information provided by the applicant on any third-party admissions application accepted by the institution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; admissions applications, criminal history of applicant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1322H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106918D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106918D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102455D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231407.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback