VA HB132 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Profane swearing in public. Removes the crime of profane swearing in public, which is currently punishable as a Class 4 misdemeanor.
Title
Profane swearing in public; removes the crime from Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1071-Adams, D.M.) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101814D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB132 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB132+hil |