VA HB1318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Motion picture production tax credit; media related exemptions. Extends from January 1, 2022, to January 1, 2027, the sunset of the motion picture production tax credit and transfers the certifying authority for the credit from the Virginia Film Office to the Virginia Tourism Authority. The bill also extends from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2027, the sunset for certain sales tax exemptions related to film production and distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motion picture production tax credit; media-related exemptions, extends sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (67-Y 26-N) (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1318ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (67-Y 26-N)
2020-03-04HouseConference report agreed to by House (67-Y 26-N)
2020-03-04 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Lucas, Barker, Newman
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-26HouseDelegates: Aird, Keam, Campbell, R.R.
2020-02-26HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-26HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-25HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendments (31-Y 7-N)
2020-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-21SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (73-Y 26-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20105703D-EH1
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1318EH1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Finance substitute agreed to 20105703D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (19-Y 2-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105703D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
2020-01-29HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104172D

Same As/Similar To

SB923 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
SB923 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.12:03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1318&201+sum+HB1318
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1318+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1318H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1318EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1318ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1001V0032+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0066+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0168+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H10V0217+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0037+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0221+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0264+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0817+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0364+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB1318+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0813HB1318+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1328+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1115HB1318+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1771+HB1318
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1744HB1318+HB1318

Bill Comments

feedback