VA HB1314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Chief Resiliency Officer. Directs the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to designate a Chief Resiliency Officer. The Chief Resiliency Officer, who shall hold no other position, shall serve as the primary coordinator of resilience and adaptation initiatives in Virginia and as the primary point of contact regarding issues related to resilience and recurrent flooding. The bill adds the Chief Resiliency Officer as a member of the Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel.
Title
Chief Resiliency Officer; Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to designate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104821D |