VA HB1305 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Savings Plan; Virginia College Opportunity Endowment and Fund. Directs the board of the Virginia College Savings Plan to deposit $250 million per year of surplus moneys from the Plan's fund into the Virginia College Opportunity Fund, established by the bill. The bill provides that such deposit shall not be made or shall be reduced in any year in which the College Opportunity Investment Advisory Committee determines that certain conditions relating to the Plan's funded status are not met. The Committee is established by the bill as an advisory committee for the Plan, for the purpose of determining the amount of deposits to be made to the Fund. Virginia College Savings Plan; Virginia College Opportunity Endowment and Fund. Directs the board of the Virginia College Savings Plan to deposit $250 million per year of surplus moneys from the Plan's fund into the Virginia College Opportunity Fund, established by the bill. The bill provides that such deposit shall not be made or shall be reduced in any year in which the College Opportunity Investment Advisory Committee determines that certain conditions relating to the Plan's funded status are not met. The Committee is established by the bill as an advisory committee for the Plan, for the purpose of determining the amount of deposits to be made to the Fund. The bill provides that financial management of the Fund is the responsibility of the board of the Plan but authorizes the board of the Virginia College Opportunity Endowment, also established by the bill, to manage a scholarship program funded by the Fund. The bill establishes an individual and corporate income tax subtraction for donations to the Fund. Under the bill, the Endowment provides scholarships to students who attend or plan to attend one of 12 eligible universities named in the bill. The bill provides that only such students who meet the eligibility requirements for a Federal Pell Grant and commit to being employed in Virginia, or being enrolled in postgraduate education in Virginia, for at least eight years after graduation from an eligible university are eligible for such scholarships.
Title
Virginia College Opportunity Endowment and Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24101175D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1305 (Carry Over) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Appropriations by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 344.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |