VA HB129 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; retail competition; purchases from net metering sellers. Authorizes individual retail customers who are eligible customer-generators under Virginia's net energy metering program to purchase electricity provided 100 percent from renewable energy exclusively for their own consumption from a net metering seller. A net metering seller is a person, other than a utility or licensed supplier, that owns or operates a renewable energy electricity generation source on premises that is owned, leased, or otherwise controlled by an eligible customer-generator and sells the electricity generated from the renewable generation source exclusively to the eligible customer-generator under a power purchase agreement. This exception to the incumbent electric utility's exclusive service territory applies even if the utility offers an approved tariff for electric energy provided 100 percent from renewable energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; purchases from net metering sellers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-27 Senate: Continued to 2013 in Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
2012-02-27 Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105441D-S1
2012-02-07 Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2012-02-07 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-02-06 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2012-02-06 House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
2012-02-03 House: Read second time and engrossed
2012-02-02 House: Read first time
2012-01-31 House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N)
2012-01-26 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
2012-01-17 House: Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
2012-01-04 House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2012-01-04 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101947D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback