VA HB1277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments. Reduces the total number and type of required Standards of Learning assessments to the minimum requirements established by the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, as amended.
Title
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 with substitute in Education by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB931 (Coyner) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20107646D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 with substitute by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101526D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1277 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Education by voice vote