VA HB1277 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp production and manufacturing. Allows the cultivation of industrial hemp by licensed growers as part of a university-managed research program. The bill defines industrial hemp as the plant Cannabis sativa with a concentration of THC no greater than that allowed by federal law, excludes industrial hemp from the definition of marijuana in the Drug Control Act, and bars the prosecution of a licensed grower under drug laws for the possession of industrial hemp as part of the research program. The bill directs the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt relevant regulations and establish an industrial hemp research program to be managed by public institutions of higher education.
Title
Industrial hemp; production and manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1277ER) |
2015-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103816D-EH1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1277EH1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Amendments by Delegate Yost agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15103816D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15103816D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2014-07-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-07-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100010D |
Same As/Similar To
SB955 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |