VA HB1270 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-11 - House: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (47-Y 48-N)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-11 - House: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (47-Y 48-N)
Summary
Pedestrians and drivers; responsibilities. Sets out the responsibilities of pedestrians and drivers at marked and unmarked crosswalks.
Title
Pedestrians and drivers; sets out responsibilities at marked and unmarked crosswalks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (47-Y 48-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossment refused by House (47-Y 48-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2008-02-11 | House: Amendment by Delegate Ebbin agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Amendment by Delegate Hull agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 8-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086188492 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1270 |