VA HB1269 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; demonstrator vehicles; vehicle buyer's orders. Establishes conditions under which dealers may sell demonstrator vehicles.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; establishes conditions under which dealers may sell demonstrator vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1269ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1269H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105145D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105145D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104379D |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1529.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |