VA HB1268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefits; employees of members of an association. Authorizes an association organized as a nonstock corporation whose members are employers conducting business in the Commonwealth to sponsor a trust that may offer or sell health plans to its members. To be eligible to sponsor a plan, the association is required to have been actively in existence for five years, have at least five members, have been formed for purposes other than obtaining or providing health benefits, and operate as a nonprofit entity. The health plans are to provide health benefits to the employees of members and the sponsoring association and their dependents. The health plan is a self-funded employee welfare benefit plan governed by and subject to the provisions of the federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974. The measure requires that health plans offered or sold under the program provide coverage for essential health benefits. The measure exempts such trust from state taxation and from insurance regulations.
Title
Health benefits; employees of members of an association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104622D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1268 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1268+hil |