VA HB1266 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship appointments, modifications, and terminations; notice to the Department of Medical Assistance Services. Requires that notices of guardianship appointments, modifications, and terminations be sent to the Department of Medical Assistance Services. Current law requires that such notices be sent only to the local department of social services.
Title
Guardianship appointments, modifications, and terminations; notice sent to DMAS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Thursday, February 25, 2016 | |
2016-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/18/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1266ER) |
2016-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103581D |