VA HB1264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program; eligible institutions; maximum reimbursement per completed noncredit workforce training program. Increases from $3,000 to $4,000 the maximum amount that the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia is permitted to reimburse to an eligible institution per completed noncredit workforce training program per eligible student pursuant to the New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program.
Title
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program; eligible institutions, maximum reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104557D |