VA HB1257 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (51-Y 48-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sanctuary policies prohibited. Provides that no locality shall adopt any ordinance, procedure, or policy that restricts the enforcement of federal immigration laws to less than the full extent permitted by federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctuary policies; enforcement of federal immigration laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: RECONSIDER (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (50-Y 50-N) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (51-Y 48-N)
2018-04-18House66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (51-Y 48-N)
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1257ER)
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 47-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (51-Y 47-N)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate with amendment (21-Y 18-N)
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-06SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-06SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 6-N)
2018-02-19SenateRereferred to Local Government
2018-02-19SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-13HousePassed House (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: RECONSIDER (52-Y 48-N)
2018-02-13HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House (52-Y 48-N)
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (50-Y 50-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and defeated by House (50-Y 50-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18102897D-E
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 49-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended (50-Y 49-N) HB1257E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 8-N)
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102897D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521409.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1257
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1257+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1257E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1257ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0154+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0112+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0568+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0748+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0781+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0782+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0335+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0361+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S07V0091+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB1257+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0978HB1257+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1458+HB1257
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1630+HB1257

Bill Comments

feedback