VA HB1256 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Redistricting; Virginia Redistricting Advisory Commission; standards and criteria. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Advisory Commission (the Commission), a statutory legislative commission tasked with proposing districts for the United States House of Representatives and for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly that adhere to certain constitutional and statutory criteria and that will be submitted for consideration and adoption by the General Assembly. The Commission will consist of eight legislative commissioners and eight citizen commissioners. The legislative commissioners consist of four members of the Senate of Virginia and four members of the House of Delegates, with equal representation given to the political parties having the highest and next highest number of members in their respective houses. The citizen commissioners are chosen by a selection committee consisting of five retired judges of the circuit courts of Virginia, from lists submitted to the selection committee by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, the leader in the House of Delegates of the political party having the next highest number of members in the House of Delegates, the President pro tempore of the Senate of Virginia, and the leader in the Senate of the political party having the next highest number of members in the Senate. The bill contains eligibility requirements for the citizen commissioners, including restrictions on holding or having held partisan national or state public office. As part of the application process for service on the Commission, the Division of Legislative Services acts as a repository for applications submitted by interested persons and is tasked with screening out applicants who are ineligible or submit incomplete applications. The applications of the citizen candidates selected by political leadership and submitted for consideration to the selection committee are public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Redistricting Advisory Commission; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseFailed to pass in House
2020-03-12HouseNo further action taken
2020-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-05SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenateDefeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-05SenateAmendment by Senator Bell agreed to
2020-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-05SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Morrissey agreed to
2020-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-05SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Morrissey agreed to
2020-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Barker agreed to 20109602D-S2
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-05SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20109414D-S1
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-05SenateFloor substitute printed 20109602D-S2 (Barker)
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109414D-S1
2020-03-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1256H1
2020-02-10HouseEmergency clause deleted
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107764D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107764D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned P & E sub: Redistricting
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20104115D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242304.3(n/a)See Bill Text
242306(n/a)See Bill Text
242309.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1256&201+sum+HB1256
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1256+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1256H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1256S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1256S2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1805V0008+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H18V0096+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0823+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0158+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0496+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB1256+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1653HB1256+HB1256
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1654HB1256+HB1256

Bill Comments

feedback