VA HB1256 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium Act; Property Owners' Association Act; lien for assessments; priority. Provides that such portion of the unpaid assessments due and owing the association for a period not to exceed three years that is attributable to providing the maintenance and upkeep of the common areas and such other areas of association responsibility expressly provided for in the declaration, including capital expenditures, shall be prior to all other liens and encumbrances except any real estate tax liens, deeds of trust, or mortgages, regardless of when recorded, on the unit or lot. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; foreclosure on lien for unpaid assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in General Laws |
2012-02-09 | House | Continued to 2013 with substitute in General Laws by voice vote |
2012-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 12104629D-H1 |
2012-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2012-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2012-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 12104353D |