VA HB1255 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits. Allows any person who is otherwise eligible to obtain a concealed handgun permit to carry a concealed handgun without a permit anywhere he may lawfully carry a handgun openly within the Commonwealth.
Title
Concealed handgun; eligibility to carry openly within Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102899D |