VA HB1254 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Summary
Juvenile crime; reports. Provides that a juvenile intake officer must report to the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the United States Department of Homeland Security a juvenile who has been detained in a secure facility based on an allegation that he committed a violent juvenile felony, if the intake officer has probable cause to believe that the juvenile is in the U.S. illegally.
Title
Juvenile records; intake officer to report to Bureau of Immigration & Customs if in U.S. illegally.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1254ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference substitute printed 089665608-H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Marsden, Gilbert, Cline | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Stolle, Reynolds, Deeds | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 93-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 93-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 2-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Stolle agreed to | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 4-N 2-A) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Printed as engrossed 081456608-E | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1254E | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081456608 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1254 |